Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Albuquerque, NM 87106 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 323 |
Individual Count | 19 |
Partnership Count | 2 |
Corporation Count | 291 |
Co-Owned Count | 11 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N9910U | Sky West Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 04/11/2024 | GRUMMAN AMERICAN AVN. CORP. AA-5A | -- | 02/01/1977 |
N998TM | Sky West Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 12/13/2021 | ESTERHUIZEN MARK F1 ROCKET | 2006 | 11/21/2006 |
N99AW | Sky West Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 07/27/2021 | BEECH F33A | 1973 | 03/15/2023 |
N9TR | Sky West Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 01/18/2024 | CESSNA T210L | 1973 | 03/12/1973 |
N194CP | Skywest Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 11/05/2021 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22 | 2008 | 07/10/2008 |
N406RJ | Skywest Aviation Inc Trustee | * | 07/21/2023 | ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY R44 II | 2008 | 10/14/2008 |
N6349F | Stephen Hanes | * | 03/27/1990 | CESSNA 182P | 1975 | 08/27/1975 |
N4948S | Taildragon Llc | * | 08/31/2011 | CESSNA TR182 | 1980 | 02/11/1980 |
N221TM | Taildragons Llc | * | 09/01/2015 | DAVIS JR WILLIAM R RV-4 | 1997 | 03/25/2021 |
N262DC | Thomas Dollmeyer | * | 09/11/2009 | OTTE DUANE RANS S-18 STINGER II | 2002 | 04/25/2002 |