Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Amarillo, TX |
|
---|---|
Total Count | 304 |
Individual Count | 122 |
Partnership Count | 4 |
Corporation Count | 152 |
Co-Owned Count | 26 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N95PW | St3 Cattle Feeders Llc | * | 04/18/2022 | CESSNA 550 | 2002 | 01/03/2020 |
N174SG | Stan Moore | * | 02/14/2011 | AMERICAN CHAMPION AIRCRAFT 7GCBC | 2008 | 02/21/2008 |
N600WL | Stan Moore | * | 10/31/2012 | CESSNA P210N | 1979 | 12/11/1979 |
N704ZD | Stephen Hayward | * | 01/08/1987 | CESSNA 150M | 1976 | 11/22/1976 |
N69984 | Stephen Stewart | * | 07/08/2019 | STINSON VULTEE V-77 | -- | 07/05/1956 |
N46ST | Sterling Taylor Inc | * | 12/16/2023 | JARED BAKER RANS DSG INC S21 OUT | 2023 | 01/03/2024 |
N293DM | T3 Engineering Corp | * | 09/03/2019 | LICHTENFELD MICHAEL KENT VANS ACFT RV-7 | 2003 | 01/24/2003 |
N9429U | Tangleport Llc | * | 10/16/2020 | CESSNA 150M | 1976 | 05/14/1976 |
N1637T | Taylor Smith | * | 10/31/2022 | CESSNA 414 | 1973 | -- |
N17256 | Taylor Smith | * | 06/06/2022 | CESSNA 150L | 1972 | 08/11/1972 |