Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Houston, TX |
|
---|---|
Total Count | 1,146 |
Individual Count | 430 |
Partnership Count | 15 |
Corporation Count | 560 |
Co-Owned Count | 77 |
Government Count | 63 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 1 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N6219C | Todd Abbott | * | 01/07/2020 | CESSNA 340A | 1977 | -- |
N555LF | Todd Madden | * | 03/29/2010 | BEECH V35B | 1979 | 07/25/2003 |
N4168 | Todd Url | * | 03/20/2020 | MOONEY M-18C 55 | 1955 | 03/31/1960 |
N7834V | Tommy Morris | * | 06/20/2017 | MOONEY M20C | 1964 | 10/21/1964 |
N8201Y | Torqmation Inc | * | 10/20/2022 | PIPER PA-30 | -- | 06/11/1969 |
N3094Y | Tpecc Llc | * | 09/12/2022 | PIPER PA-32R-301T | -- | -- |
N175TA | Tracy Anderson | * | 01/12/2009 | CESSNA 175 | 1958 | 03/26/1958 |
N790JR | Transenergie Inc | * | 05/17/2021 | ISRAEL AIRCRAFT INDUSTRIES 1124A | 1984 | 06/27/1985 |
N38U | Travis Lagrone | * | 11/07/2018 | SCHEMPP-HIRTH VENTUS-B | 1982 | 10/19/1982 |
N49946 | Travis Lagrone | * | 08/06/2015 | SCHLEICHER ASW-20 | 1979 | 05/23/2003 |