Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Houston, TX |
|
---|---|
Total Count | 1,149 |
Individual Count | 431 |
Partnership Count | 16 |
Corporation Count | 564 |
Co-Owned Count | 74 |
Government Count | 63 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 1 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N761QV | Philip Navratil | * | 03/25/2003 | CESSNA 210M | 1977 | 01/24/1978 |
N8175B | Philip Smith | * | 01/09/2012 | CESSNA 172 | 1957 | 06/12/1957 |
N1020M | Philip Winner | * | 05/14/2024 | CESSNA 182P | 1975 | 09/10/1975 |
N711WJ | Philippe Beaubien | * | 06/11/2018 | MOONEY M20R | 2005 | 07/12/2005 |
N83RG | Phillip Kattchee | * | 06/19/2007 | BEECH F33A | 1987 | 12/21/1987 |
N80FB | Phronesis Enterprises Too Llc | * | 12/31/2023 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22 | 2004 | 08/25/2004 |
N11CE | Pierre Melcher | * | 03/24/2020 | CESSNA A185F | 1974 | 10/10/1974 |
N123PM | Pipe In The Sky Aviation Llc | * | 01/25/2023 | HONDA AIRCRAFT CO LLC HA-420 | 2018 | 08/31/2018 |
N42MS | Plukair Texas Llc | * | 09/24/1998 | ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL 500-S | 1976 | 07/08/1976 |
N818BD | Poarch Swinbank Investments Llc | * | 11/18/2013 | LEARJET INC 45 | -- | -- |