Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Ogden, UT 84403 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 268 |
Individual Count | 13 |
Partnership Count | 0 |
Corporation Count | 251 |
Co-Owned Count | 4 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N665PW | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 07/20/2023 | CESSNA 182S | 1999 | 06/21/1999 |
N66HR | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 12/15/2021 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SF50 | 2021 | 11/30/2021 |
N722MT | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 02/09/2023 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22 | 2023 | 01/28/2023 |
N7317 | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 06/01/2023 | PILATUS AIRCRAFT LTD PC-24 | 2022 | 01/27/2022 |
N80388 | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 04/25/2022 | BEECH D18S | 1946 | -- |
N808WS | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 04/17/2023 | SIMON RALF QUICKIE 2 | 2005 | 04/08/2005 |
N81PR | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 03/20/2023 | CESSNA T206H | 2006 | 03/01/2023 |
N887LF | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 10/08/2023 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22 | 2023 | 09/01/2023 |
N900AJ | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 05/18/2023 | PIPER PA-34-200T | 1978 | 12/16/2010 |
N90584 | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 09/17/2021 | HUGHES 269A | -- | 06/12/1998 |