Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Ogden, UT 84403 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 268 |
Individual Count | 13 |
Partnership Count | 0 |
Corporation Count | 251 |
Co-Owned Count | 4 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N214CT | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 07/06/2022 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22 | 2009 | 12/15/2009 |
N225RH | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 06/23/2023 | BELL 206L-3 | 1992 | 07/17/1996 |
N226NG | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 05/04/2021 | PILATUS AIRCRAFT LTD PC-12/47E | 2010 | 07/07/2010 |
N2439B | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 07/15/2021 | CESSNA 182T | 2001 | 04/10/2001 |
N2442 | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 04/11/2023 | A VAN NIEROP RISEN 915IS | 2023 | 05/03/2023 |
N246PV | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 11/17/2022 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22T | 2020 | 04/02/2020 |
N279ST | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 05/24/2021 | PIPER PA46-500TP | 2006 | 11/10/2006 |
N2808P | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 09/04/2023 | PIPER PA-22-150 | 1955 | 06/13/1956 |
N28FY | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 01/18/2023 | MOONEY M20J | 1981 | 10/27/1981 |
N28KG | Valiair Limited Co Trustee | * | 04/07/2023 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22T | 2023 | 02/24/2023 |