Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Ogden, UT 84403 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 268 |
Individual Count | 13 |
Partnership Count | 0 |
Corporation Count | 251 |
Co-Owned Count | 4 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N181BD | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 06/01/2022 | BEECH B-60 | -- | -- |
N202DS | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 03/20/2023 | PIPER PA-31-325 | 1978 | 01/18/1979 |
N207EA | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 11/20/2023 | ECLIPSE AVIATION CORP EA500 | 2008 | 06/11/2008 |
N210RE | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 06/22/2023 | CESSNA P210R | -- | 12/17/2009 |
N212DJ | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 06/07/2022 | JASON RICHARD P VANS-JASON RV8A | 2014 | 12/03/2014 |
N215CD | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 03/09/2022 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR20 | 2001 | 01/18/2001 |
N221CL | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 12/10/2021 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22T | 2021 | 04/19/2021 |
N222KW | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 08/22/2023 | CESSNA T182T | 2007 | 07/13/2007 |
N226CL | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 02/06/2023 | CIRRUS DESIGN CORP SR22T | 2019 | 04/02/2019 |
N231HH | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 04/25/2023 | MOONEY AIRCRAFT CORP. M20K | 1979 | 03/15/1979 |