Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Ogden, UT 84403 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 268 |
Individual Count | 13 |
Partnership Count | 0 |
Corporation Count | 251 |
Co-Owned Count | 4 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N60058 | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 03/29/2022 | STINSON VULTEE V-77 | 1944 | 12/20/1958 |
N600XR | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 06/05/2023 | LEARJET INC 60 | 2007 | 03/18/2019 |
N609MT | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 05/04/2023 | CESSNA S550 | -- | 01/16/1987 |
N60BM | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 08/28/2023 | AERO COMMANDER 690A | -- | 03/08/2008 |
N611MA | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 09/08/2021 | AVIAT AIRCRAFT INC A-1C-180 | 2013 | 07/23/2013 |
N6283N | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 07/13/2023 | BEECH A36 | 1982 | 01/15/1982 |
N6398S | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 05/23/2023 | CESSNA R182 | -- | 12/11/1980 |
N63HP | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 05/19/2023 | PIPER AIRCRAFT INC PA 46-350P | 2009 | 03/02/2012 |
N648KM | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 07/13/2023 | DIAMOND AIRCRAFT IND GMBH DA 42 | 2007 | 08/29/2018 |
N654DT | Valiair Lc Trustee | * | 05/25/2023 | IAN MOORE SLING TSI | 2023 | 04/18/2023 |