Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Wasilla, AK 99623 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 261 |
Individual Count | 174 |
Partnership Count | 6 |
Corporation Count | 23 |
Co-Owned Count | 58 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N7185B | Mark Kistler | * | 11/01/2021 | PIPER PA-18-150 | 1956 | 05/23/1957 |
N93456 | Mark Ward | * | 08/02/2024 | HILLER UH-12D | 1958 | 11/19/1973 |
N35523 | Martin Dickey | * | 11/08/2023 | PIPER J3C-65 | 1941 | 06/02/1993 |
N212AK | Martin Hinshaw | * | 12/16/2019 | ENSTROM F-28C | 1978 | 02/28/2020 |
N25BY | Martin Hinshaw | * | 06/01/2023 | STOL UC-1 | 1982 | 12/22/1982 |
N905WD | Martin Hinshaw | * | 05/22/2023 | WD AIRCRAFT INVESTMENTS LLC AIRCAM | -- | -- |
N1387G | Martinus List | * | 06/29/2021 | PIPER PA-18-135 | -- | 06/21/1982 |
N4911E | Martinus List | * | 07/10/2014 | CESSNA A185F | 1979 | 08/25/1979 |
N170AW | Matthew Ellis | * | 12/26/2022 | CESSNA 170B | 1955 | 06/25/1956 |
N3550S | Matthew Swalling | * | 01/03/2019 | CESSNA 172E | 1963 | 10/24/1963 |