Download this list of aircraft owners and registration data to your computer/laptop/phone | |
Wasilla, AK 99623 |
|
---|---|
Total Aircraft Registration Count | 261 |
Individual Count | 174 |
Partnership Count | 6 |
Corporation Count | 23 |
Co-Owned Count | 58 |
Government Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Corporation Count | 0 |
Non-Citizen Co-Owned Count | 0 |
N-Number | Aircraft Registrant Name | Registered Address | Certificate Issue Date | Aircraft Manufacturer & Model | Year Mfr | AirWorthiness Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N3754D | Eric Eckard | * | 03/31/2021 | CESSNA 182A | 1957 | 06/14/1957 |
N4217Z | Erik Schock | * | 09/11/2007 | PIPER PA-18-150 | 1974 | 01/04/1974 |
N9460T | Evermore Aviation Llc | * | 10/21/2016 | HUGHES HELICOPTERS INC 369E | 1988 | 02/19/2008 |
N5357X | Firn Line Aviation Inc | * | 07/31/2024 | PIPER PA-18-150 | -- | 06/12/1984 |
N795AK | Firn Line Aviation Inc | * | 06/10/2021 | PIPER PA-18 | 1958 | 07/20/1992 |
N4213Q | Fogarty Aviation Inc | * | 02/19/1997 | CESSNA 172L | 1971 | 09/28/1971 |
N8335A | Forrest Haack | * | 07/17/2024 | CESSNA 170B | -- | 02/07/1956 |
N43140 | G & J Enterprises | * | 05/19/2014 | TAYLORCRAFT BC12-D | 1946 | 12/21/1955 |
N72325 | Gerald Soares | * | 07/28/2023 | CESSNA 140 | -- | 02/19/1955 |
N3518S | Gregory Varner | * | 03/26/2018 | CESSNA 172E | 1963 | 10/12/1963 |